Trustees 1ST MERTON PARK SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 267800

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Reeks | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey James Clayden | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Crosby | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clark | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rachel McDonald | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Josephine Dahlstrom | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Tamsin Maddison | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Renton | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GARRETT | Trustee | 10 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS VICKY TULLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KATHY DI FRANCO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.