Trustees 1st Newport IW Scout Group (The Old Guard)
Charity number: 267803

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Alison Lithgow | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Hardy | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||
James Anthony Wollweber | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Blake | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maire Margaret Reeves | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Wollweber | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Turner | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN DAVID HUNNYBUN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.