Accounts and annual returns THE PALGRAVE BROWN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 267848
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 05 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 27 July 2009 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2008 03 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 03 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2007 04 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 05 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2006 07 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 05 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 15 November 2005 On Time