Accounts and annual returns SWAFFHAM PRIOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 267862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 May 2024 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window