Trustees SWAFFHAM PRIOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 267862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillip Blackburn Chair 21 April 2022
None on record
Karen King Trustee 02 April 2025
None on record
Kate Muscroft Trustee 02 April 2025
None on record
Dr Emily Thomas Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Keith Carter Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Daniel Spencer Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Steven Harbert Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Jennifer Brand Trustee 15 June 2017
None on record