THE DOUGLAS MARTIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity distributes small sums of money to cases of individual hardship or need - BUT only to cases known to the trustees or through organisations known to the trustees. Unsolicited requests will not be supported or responded to. All grants are dealt with by written communication with any trustee. The charity also owns a small parcel of land managed for biodiversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Devon
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 October 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Elizabeth Butler | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Miriam Pollard | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HAROLD EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.67k | £25.78k | £27.37k | £28.04k | £35.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.49k | £37.49k | £25.63k | £17.43k | £19.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 249 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY AT SUCH TIMES IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE DONOR MAY SPECIFY OR THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDRUSH
SPADE OAK REACH
COOKHAM
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 9RQ
- Phone:
- 01628 810444
- Email:
- jonnyhevans@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window