ACTION FOR PRISONERS' FAMILIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Action for Prisoners' Families is the national organisation for those interested in the well being of prisoners and offenders' families. APF works to reduce the negative impact of imprisonment and community sentencing on families. We work across statutory, private and voluntary sectors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £68,500 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 1974: Standard registration
- 08 July 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 July 2016: Funds transferred to 1077722 FAMILY LIVES
- ACTION FOR PRISONERS' FAMILIES (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF VISTORS' CENTRES LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE FEDERATION OF PRISONERS FAMILIES SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- THE FEDERATION OF PRISONERS FAMILIES SUPPORT GROUPS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £655.94k | £798.57k | £708.64k | £334.79k | £164.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £644.49k | £734.72k | £797.92k | £354.41k | £252.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £68.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £175.39k | £103.47k | £148.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.47k | £7.33k | £302 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £460.70k | £687.77k | £559.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £169 | £0 | £148 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £10.21k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £601.82k | £695.98k | £765.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.29k | £21.19k | £16.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 03 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 03 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 06 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 06 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 18 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/04/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/10/2011
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND OF HARDSHIP, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS, AMONG FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS OF PERSONS WHO ARE ACCUSED OF OR HAVE BEEN CONVICTED OF A CRIMINAL OFFENCE OR ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window