Financial history THE MONTPELIER AND CLIFTON HILL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.15k £2.06k £981 £1.43k £2.19k
Total expenditure £2.79k £1.51k £399 £1.02k £972
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A