GOSPEL PRINTING MISSION LIMITED

Charity Number: 267903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Production of basic Christian literature in nearly 35 languages and sent to approximately 55 countries: 35 of these countries are receiving regularly from the Gospel Printing Mission, including Great Britain. ALL GRANTS OF LITERATURE are made in kind by sending the parcels of literature to the respective countries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,129
Total expenditure: £26,490

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Angola
  • Argentina
  • Brazil
  • Cameroon
  • Chile
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Cuba
  • Ecuador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Ethiopia
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Guyana
  • India
  • Ivory Coast
  • Kenya
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Mauritius
  • Mozambique
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Peru
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Senegal
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Tanzania
  • Togo
  • Uganda
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER MASON Trustee 10 March 2017
THE AQUASPORTS CROSS TRUST
Received: On time
MARGARET RUTH COTTON Trustee 11 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.27k £10.56k £47.79k £17.90k £5.13k
Total expenditure £42.98k £20.10k £28.46k £20.92k £26.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 ROXY AVENUE
ROMFORD
RM6 4AY
Phone:
02085972140