THE KIRKWOOD MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Three main areas of activity: firstly medical research, particularly respiratory disease,and uncommon medical diseases. Then educational projects, and lastly for the relief of poverty and famine on causes well known or personal to the Trustees whereby donations are significant . The Trustees are proactive and the charity's resources are fully committed for the foreseeable future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HON J S KIRKWOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUTH EMILY KIRKWOOD AZMAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE VICTORIA ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.90k | £22.36k | £29.24k | £27.57k | £26.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.75k | £27.00k | £31.30k | £29.00k | £29.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 5TH JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
1. PAYMENT OF $500 PER ANNUM TO THE CHEST AND HEART ASSOCIATION DURING EACH FOR THE FIRST SEVEN FINANCIAL YEARS OF THE FUND. 2. THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITIES AND/OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AS THE SETTLORS MAY DETERMINE. 3. AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SURVIVOR OF THE SETTLORS THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITIES AND/OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CEARNE
KENT HATCH ROAD
CROCKHAM HILL
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 6SZ
- Phone:
- 01883714639
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window