UBLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Ubley, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreational and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 13 September 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Smart | Chair | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen kingsland | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christabel Peacock | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Williams | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rundle | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christian Crawfurd | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHARTER | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ARTHUR KNIGHT | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BLANCHARD | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
The Parish Council of Ubley | Trustee | 15 March 1974 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.59k | £24.40k | £29.48k | £23.13k | £24.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.46k | £7.33k | £20.42k | £18.45k | £22.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.03k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 15TH MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABLITANTS OF THE PARISH OF UBLEY WITHOUT DISTINCTIONOF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF UBLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAKESIDE
FROG LANE
UBLEY
BRISTOL
BS40 6PW
- Phone:
- 07885 910237
- Email:
- juliasmart@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window