SUSSEX COUNTY BOWLS (MEN'S SECTION) BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund assists Sussex bowlers in need and poor dependents of deceased bowlers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 August 1974: Standard registration
- SUSSEX COUNTY BOWLING ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Anthony Kinnard | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Goman | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Chuter | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Swainston | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £657 | £1.78k | £1.07k | £1.03k | £944 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £200 | £1.00k | £2.22k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 December 2023 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/11/1973 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST POOR SUSSEX BOWLERS IN NEED WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF SUBSCRIBING CLUBS AFFILIATED TO THE COUNTY ASSOCIATION AND POOR DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH CLUBS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 TILLER CLOSE
YAPTON
ARUNDEL
BN18 0FZ
- Phone:
- 01243553001
- Email:
- JOHN.KINNARD2@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
sussexcb.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window