Financial history OAKLEY RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.84k £11.74k £19.10k £13.45k £30.53k
Total expenditure £18.00k £12.01k £19.87k £14.30k £31.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A