THE BRITISH ARCHITECTURAL LIBRARY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST PRIMARILY MAKES GRANTS TO PRESERVE AND EXTEND A COLLECTION OF OVER FOUR MILLION ITEMS IN THE BRITISH ARCHITECTURAL LIBRARY AND ASSISTS IN PROVIDING AN EXTENSIVE PROGRAMME OF AWARDS,TALKS EXHIBITIONS AND EDUCATION EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 August 1974: Standard registration
- 20 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BALT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 21 JUNE 1996 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
IN MAKING GRANTS TO THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF BRITISH ARCHITECTS FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS DOCUMENTS DRAWINGS POTOGRAPHS PICTURES FURNITURE EQUIPMENT MODELS SOUND OR VISUAL RECORDINGS AND OTHER MATERIALS AND CHATTELS FOR RETENTION DISPLAY OR USE IN THE COLLECTION OF BOOKS PRESENTLY KNOWN AS THE SIR BANISTER FLETCHER LIBRARY THE COLLECTION OF DRAWINGS PRESENTLY KNOWN AS THE RIBA DRAWINGS COLLECTION AND ALL FURTHER OR OTHER COLLECTIONS ADMINISTERED BY THE ROYAL INSTITUTE TOGETHER COMPRISING A RESOURCE OF KNOWLEDGE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE BRITISH ARCHITECTURAL LIBRARY AND FOR ALL OTHER PURPOSES PERTINENT TO THE MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE BRITISH ARCHITECTURAL LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window