INAS (ITALIAN WELFARE) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide general advice and assistance, particularly in social security and state benefit matters, to persons of Italian nationality and to other European citizens resident in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GIANLUIGI PETTENI | Chair | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Antonietta Bortone-Tinney | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
RONALD PATRICK DOUGLAS | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DOMENIC PINI | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Dr GIAN LUCA LODETTI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARTINO CRANCHI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
LUCIANO LAMBERTI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £401.87k | £366.18k | £301.64k | £271.39k | £350.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.85k | £331.27k | £336.92k | £331.97k | £371.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £66.26k | £32.59k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCOPORATED 6TH JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT PERSONS OF ITALIAN NATIONALITY WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY RELIEVING EITHE GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THOSE OF THE BENEFICIAL CLASS WHO ARE IN CONDITITONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
248 VAUXHALL BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SW1V 1AU
- Phone:
- 02078342157
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window