Financial history LEATHERHEAD DIVISION GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.53k £5.85k £9.42k £4.12k £9.46k
Total expenditure £5.83k £5.83k £9.22k £4.66k £8.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A