Paulton Memorial Hospital League of Friends

Charity Number: 267973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Recieving donations in lieu of flowers at funerals, organising annual fetes, running a charity shop and sweet trolley. Proceeds are used to donate equipment and furnishings to Paulton Memorial Hospital for the aid and treatment of patients.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £16,729
Total expenditure: £19,961

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE PAULTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILLY GOULD Chair 26 August 2011
None on record
Caroline Tanner Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Mark Hosking Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Kathryn Burge Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Tracy Bidwell Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Anna Evans Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
JANE TOWELLS Trustee 26 August 2011
None on record
Dr KATE FALLON Trustee 26 August 2011
None on record
PAULINE ROGERS Trustee 26 August 2011
None on record
JANET YOUNG Trustee
None on record
BOB GOODE Trustee
None on record
JAYNE STENNER Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE WYNNE Trustee
None on record
TERRY WYNNE Trustee
None on record
Ian HOUSE Trustee
None on record
DAVID MONTACUTE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.52k £122.16k £11.99k £11.45k £16.73k
Total expenditure £17.03k £25.65k £11.28k £129.26k £19.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 01 May 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 July 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 July 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 October 2022 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 October 2022 170 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 June 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 HIGH MEADOWS
MIDSOMER NORTON
RADSTOCK
BA3 2RY
Phone:
07967090539
Website:

No information available