LOWESTOFT MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and operate a Museum that is open to the public. The Museum is run solely by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £136,641 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 August 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Duerden | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Walker | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Mundy | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Diestelkamp | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Howe | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andree Gee | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT STANNARD | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|||||
IRENE ALMA O'TOOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL MACDONALD DURBIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.76k | £158 | £10.64k | £14.37k | £149.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.46k | £2.06k | £17.04k | £11.78k | £10.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £700 | £136.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN OR NEAR LOWESTOFT FOR THE EXHIBITION OF FINE AND USEFUL ARTS, ETHNOLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOLOGY, BOTANY AND NATURAL HISTORY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 23 August 1974 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lowestoft Museum
Broad House
Nicholas Everitt Park
LOWESTOFT
Suffolk
NR33 9JR
- Phone:
- 01502511457
- Email:
- info@lowestoftmuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window