SWINDON WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 268048
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity manages a refuge, comprising 22 self contained flats. It also operates a helpline and manages an Outreach support service and IDVA service for victims of domestic abuse within the Swindon area. Helpline and Refuge services are accessible 24 hours a day, 365 days a year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2017

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1974: Standard registration
  • 26 October 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 26 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1175148 Society Without Abuse
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWINDON WOMENS REFUGE (Working name)
  • SWINDON WOMEN'S REFUGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/11/2017
Total gross income £619.26k £633.68k £794.23k £717.53k £503.64k
Total expenditure £639.22k £693.06k £679.61k £784.21k £481.07k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £307.00k £307.00k £200.00k £182.59k
Income - Donations and legacies £47.70k £24.06k £50.36k £17.04k £13.91k
Income - Other trading activities £1.49k £5.62k £6.88k £2.28k £2.79k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £735.65k £697.32k £486.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £141 £1.33k £1.34k £888 £485
Income - Other £569.93k £602.67k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £623.01k £670.56k £673.05k £782.64k £480.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £6.55k £1.56k £1.06k
Expenditure - Governance £15.14k £18.50k £15.88k £23.77k £16.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/11/2017
Own use assets £21.50k £21.49k £18.55k £13.91k £16.59k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £307.92k £314.00k £364.51k £307.76k £343.45k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £18.01k £83.46k £16.40k £21.69k £37.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 30 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 30 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 20 January 2016 On Time