Financial history THE FARTHING TRUST

Charity number: 268066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £44.56k £236.01k £56.14k £225.00k £248.50k
Total expenditure £213.66k £205.26k £360.27k £375.65k £527.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A