THE FARTHING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was formed as a vehicle to meet charitable causes in any area of the world. All manner of charitable causes are supported, predominantly in the areas of education, faith, health, human rights and reconciliation and the relief of those in need. The Trust rarely supports GAP year students or applications for educational courses. The Trust prioritizes small projects with "seed corn" funding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Bhutan
- Burkina Faso
- India
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Nicaragua
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Syria
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 August 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ms E Bell | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Mr J Martin | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
J MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
A WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.56k | £236.01k | £56.14k | £225.00k | £248.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.66k | £205.26k | £360.27k | £375.65k | £527.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 276
Newmarket
CB8 1GW
- Phone:
- 07598565623
- Email:
- thefarthingtrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window