CAMBRIDGE HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cambridge Historical Society was started in 1923 as the Faculty's first research seminar, the following year began publishing the Cambridge Historical Journal, one of the country's leading scholarly periodicals, and more recently has been making annual awards of small grants to support research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 June 1975: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR SIR CHRISTOPHER CLARK | Chair | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ROSAMOND DEBORAH MCITTERICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358 | £337 | £317 | £303 | £286 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1.TH OCTOBER 1971 AND AMENDED 18TH JUNE 1974 AND 23RD MAY 1975
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HISTORICAL STUDY, RESEARCH AND DISCUSSION IN CAMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
University of Cambridge
Faculty of History
West Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 9EF
- Phone:
- 01223767860
- Email:
- accounts@hist.cam.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window