GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT JEWISH COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious, social, education and burial activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 September 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Bloomberg | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RAY WICKSMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £3.45k | £1.87k | £2.17k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.08k | £4.62k | £1.82k | £2.34k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 September 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 15TH NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
(A) THE FOUNDING, ERECTING, MAINTAINING AND CARRYING ON IN GUILDFORD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD OF A PLACE, OR PLACES OF WORSHIP FOR PERSONS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION. (B) THE GIVING OF INSTRUCTION IN RELIGIOUS SUBJECTS TO PERSONS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION. (C) TO ENSURE A MEANS OF BURIEL FOR PERSONS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION. (D) THE PROVISION OF AID AND RELIEF FOR POOR PERSONS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION. (E) TO FOUND, ERECT AND PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HALLS OR INSTUTUTES OR OTHER PLACES FOR RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE JEWISH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Poyle Road
GUILDFORD
GU1 3SL
- Phone:
- 01483566011
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window