Register of Charities - The Charity Commission LANGHAM TRUST
Charity Number: 312114-1
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 26 OCTOBER 1922 AS VARIED BY LETTER DATED 8 OCTOBER 1954
Charitable objects
CHARITY NOW AMALGAMATED INTO CHARITY NUMBER 312027 UNDER SCHEME DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1994.
PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL SCHOLARSHIP TENABLE AT THE FARNHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS. PROVISION OF THREE PRIZES FOR MERITORIOUS 5TH OR 6TH FORM WORK
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 08 May 1962: Standard registration
- 08 March 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.