CORNWALL AMBULANCE SERVICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist financially or otherwise, those personnel, or former, or retired personnel and theiri mmediate dependants, who by virtue of illness or premature retirement, or any other reason are in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 May 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAUN WILKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeannette Caroline Bate | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Janet Booth | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Mankee | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Constance Trounson | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Keith Wearne | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Buscombe | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roseanna McCammick | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brian Pascoe | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD KIMBERLEY | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMY SAINSBURY | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW EXELBY | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ball | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Howard Westwood | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MISS VANESSA MIREILLE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY NEIL ALBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SEAN THOMAS JOHN GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.37k | £16.74k | £19.53k | £18.58k | £23.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.67k | £19.23k | £13.58k | £24.17k | £18.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 20 JULY 1994 as amended on 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE THOSE PERSONNEL OR FORMER OR RETIRED PERSONNEL OF THE CORNWALL AMBLANCE SERVICE AND THEIR IMMEDIATE DEPENDATNS WHO, BY VIRTUE OF ILLNESS OR PREMATURE RETIREMENT OR ANY OTHER REASON ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Slades Road
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL25 4HA
- Phone:
- 0172671357
- Email:
- stephenmorcom@swast.nhs.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window