Trustees CORNWALL AMBULANCE SERVICE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 268123

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAUN WILKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeannette Caroline Bate | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Janet Booth | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Mankee | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Constance Trounson | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Keith Wearne | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Buscombe | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roseanna McCammick | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brian Pascoe | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD KIMBERLEY | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMY SAINSBURY | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW EXELBY | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ball | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Howard Westwood | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MISS VANESSA MIREILLE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY NEIL ALBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SEAN THOMAS JOHN GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.