THE MUSBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage the village hall on behalf of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 16 September 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WILLIAM PERRYMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rex Orr | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Smitham | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Gooding | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY OBORN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.30k | £15.24k | £19.34k | £14.28k | £14.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | £11.14k | £29.90k | £12.32k | £13.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD JULY 1929
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MUSBURY WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OPINIONS AND OTHERWISE FOR THE GENERAL USE OF THE SAID PARISH OF MUSBURY WETHER FOR RELIGIOUS POLITICAL EDUCATIONAL OR SOCIAL PURPOSES OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MUSBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Musbury Village Hall
Seaton Road
Musbury
Aminster
DEVON
EX13 8AJ
- Phone:
- 07540969844
- Email:
- jackie.gooding8@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window