Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE WESTERN MATHEMATICS PRIZE FUND
Charity Number: 312114-5
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH NOVEMBER 1959 AND SCHEME SEALED 4TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
CHARITY NOW AMALGAMATED INTO CHARITY NUMBER 312027 UNDER SCHEME DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1994.
PURCHASE OF BOOKS FOR USE IN SCHOOL LIBRARY IN MATHEMATICS
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Registration history
- 18 February 1992: Standard registration
- 08 March 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.