HIGH HURSTWOOD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity was formed to maintain and improve the village hall. This not only includes facilities but also the opportunities for local residents to use it for sports and social clubs as well as an educational centre for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 28 October 1974: Standard registration
- HIGH HURSTWOOD VILLAGE COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDY BARTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Angela Judith Chapman | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Norman Ranft | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Margaret Duck | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JEFFREY WOLSEY-COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.63k | £15.56k | £26.94k | £26.80k | £26.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.41k | £15.73k | £26.32k | £25.17k | £36.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MARCH 1952 AND SCHEME 15 JULY 1987
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL WARD OF HIGH HURSTWOOD IN THE PARISH OF BUXTED WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITHE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
HIGH HURSTWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH HURSTWOOD HOUSE
CHILLIES LANE
HIGH HURSTWOOD
UCKFIELD
TN22 4AD
- Phone:
- 07720 810523
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window