Financial history Friends of Forty Hill School

Charity Number: 268188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £12.93k £8.41k £6.72k £7.92k £20.99k
Total expenditure £19.91k £4.26k £4.16k £6.88k £15.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A