THEBERTON AND EASTBRIDGE COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
meeting place for the community. own village hall used for social community activities covers all ages and religious beliefs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 September 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Ginger | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shell Moulton | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Whitewick | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
R M BROWN | Trustee | 03 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM KEEBLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/04/2020 | 15/04/2021 | 15/04/2022 | 15/04/2023 | 15/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.34k | £15.25k | £19.69k | £3.14k | £2.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £14.81k | £3.36k | £7.15k | £4.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 April 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 20TH JANUARY 1971
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS, COMMUNITY CENTRES AND OTHER AMENITIES OF A SIMILAR CHARACTER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN THEBERTON AND EASTBRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED IN LAW TO BE CHARITABLE BY IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THEBERTON AND EASTBRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
- 20 September 1974 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CHURCH ROAD
THEBERTON
LEISTON
IP16 4SB
- Phone:
- 01728833559
- Email:
- Purplenan57@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window