Accounts and annual returns FRANCIS GEORGE THORPE TRUST

Charity number: 268201
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 27 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 22 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 22 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 12 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 09 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required