Charity overview GEORGE STURT MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
Charity number: 312114-12
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME 4 OCTOBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME 4 JULY 1990
Charitable objects
CHARITY NOW AMALGAMATED INTO CHARITY NUMBER 312027 UNDER SCHEME DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1994.
PURCHASE OF SCIENCE BOOKS FOR USE IN SCHOOL LIBRARY
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Registration history
- 18 February 1992: Standard registration
- 08 March 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.