HOVE ST ANDREW (OLD CHURCH) HOVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in school. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 03 October 1974: Standard registration
- 13 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST ANDREW (OLD CHURCH) HOVE (Working name)
- HOVE ST ANDREW'S CHURCHYARD FUNDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.86k | £85.30k | £98.91k | £108.62k | £90.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.58k | £128.95k | £95.72k | £119.57k | £108.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 15 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 19 May 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 16 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 02 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 27 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 27 December 2007 | 57 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 30 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 30 August 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HOVE CORPORATION ACT 1966 AS AMENDED 11TH MAY 1972
Charitable objects
(A) THE ERECTION THE SPECIFIED LANDS OF A PARISH HALL. (B) THE REMOVAL BY THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF HUMAN REMAINS. (C) THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH AND OF SO MUCH OF THE CHURCHYARD AS DOES NOT FORM PART OF THE SPECIFIED LANDS. (D) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE BENEFICE INCOME OF THE BENEFICE WHICH MAY BE BY WAY OF PAYMENT TO THE CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND. (E) THE PURCHASE, DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF LAND AND BUILDINGS HELD OR USED OR TO BE HELD OR USED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARISH. (F) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST ANDREW, HOVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window