24TH HASTINGS (WILLIAM PARKER) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a balanced programme of training and activities to our youth members in accordance with the guidelines laid down by the Scout Association, including camping, hiking, physical skills, creative activities and leadership training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 September 1974: Standard registration
- 24TH HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jolene Millen | Chair | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donata Isozu | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Hall | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Vaughan | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Spencer | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Gooch | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME STOODLEY | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN POPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.22k | £23.06k | £22.03k | £42.08k | £81.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.08k | £10.33k | £22.38k | £42.12k | £73.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.97k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 January 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ark Alexandra Academy
William Parker Campus
Park Avenue
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 2PG
- Phone:
- 07743 859877
- Email:
- gsl@24thhastingsscouts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window