Financial history 3RD WELLING (ST STEPHENS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 268278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.07k £14.81k £10.25k £12.95k £19.59k
Total expenditure £14.67k £13.67k £7.15k £21.32k £22.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A