Financial history THE FEDERATION OF CHILDREN'S BOOK GROUPS

Charity number: 268289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £31.57k £24.97k £33.57k £43.28k £49.77k
Total expenditure £28.76k £4.51k £33.43k £43.57k £43.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A