Financial history THE MARGATE SILVER BAND TRADING AS CANTIUM BRASS

Charity number: 268291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £700 £0 £0 £0 £700
Total expenditure £4.82k £1.75k £16.09k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A