THE MARGATE SILVER BAND TRADING AS CANTIUM BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cantium Brass, formerly Margate Silver Band are based in Kent and boasts an enviable reputation for providing quality entertainment all over the Country and can often be heard performing on Bandstands in Kent. Our aim, is to consistently produce music at a very high standard which in turn reflects outstanding value for money to Concert Promoters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 29 October 1974: Standard registration
- CANTIUM BRASS (Working name)
- THE MARGATE SILVER BAND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUSSELL MARK HALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GEMMA PARSONS | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEIRDRE WARDLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIDGETTE MARIE GOOLD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LOUIS GOOLD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £700 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £700 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82k | £1.75k | £16.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1974 AND AS AMENDED ON 11TH DECEMBER 1996 AND 12TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND IN PARTICULAR 1. TO INSTRUCT CONDUCTORS AND MUSICIANS; 2. TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OR AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS AND TO SUBSCRIBE MONEY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES; 3. TO DO ALL OTHER THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Betteshanger Sports and Social Club
The Sportsground, Cavell Square
Deal
Kent
CT14 9HN
- Phone:
- 01304380332
- Email:
- cantiumbrass@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window