THE NATIONAL PORTRAITURE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 1974: Standard registration
- 24 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2007 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 22 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 28 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH AUGUST 1974
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN REPRESENTATIONAL AND FIGURATIVE ART AND IN PARTICULAR IN DRAUGHTSMANSHIP IN REPRESENTATIONAL AND FIGURATIVE ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window