NORTHAM LEISURE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 08 October 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD DAVID BRADFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HENDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHYLLIS MAUD DANIEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SILVIA COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL TENNANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.67k | £6.04k | £8.78k | £9.43k | £1.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.10k | £6.61k | £10.93k | £10.93k | £976 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN THE PARISH OF NORTHAM.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREETOPS
LAKENHAM HILL
NORTHAM
BIDEFORD
EX39 1JH
- Phone:
- 01237474360
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window