THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BELL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using the income from investment to make grants towards the maintance of church bells within the Diocese of Oxford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 04 November 1974: Standard registration
- 21 January 2020: Funds received from 284053 OXFORD DIOCESAN GUILD OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS RESTO...
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN MARCHBANK | Chair | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DENNISS CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
STUART GIBSON | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LANE | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
KEN DAVENPORT | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JAMES GATWARD | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM CLIFTON | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
STUART FREDERICK GIBSON | Trustee | 13 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.01k | £11.69k | £31.53k | £39.99k | £44.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.64k | £18.23k | £43.93k | £1.74k | £12.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
13 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
TO COLLECT AND RAISE SUMS OF MONEY AND TO APPLY THE INCOME ARISING FROM THE INVESTMENT OF SUCH SUMS IN OR TOWARDS THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND RENEWAL OF THE CHURCH BELLS IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Croft
Milton Hill
Steventon
Abingdon
OX13 6BD
- Phone:
- 07802261432
- Email:
- treasurer@odg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window