Financial history EYNSHAM PRESCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 268409
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £106.40k £141.71k £97.65k £102.38k £130.86k
Total expenditure £115.85k £147.98k £118.40k £82.07k £126.74k
Income from government contracts £105.19k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £48.99k £82.59k