Governing document EYNSHAM PRESCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 268409
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/06/1974 AS AMENDED ON 05/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2013 as amended on 28 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EYNSHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.