CAMBRIDGE TALKING NEWS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a weekly recording on USB disk of news and general features to blind and partially sighted people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 11 December 1974: Standard registration
- CAMBRIDGE TALKING NEWS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NICK REDMAYNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DENISE WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN ALAN GIENKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £1.80k | £2.04k | £1.74k | £513 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82k | £2.33k | £1.42k | £778 | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18TH NOVEMBER 1974 AND AMENDED 9TH NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABLILTY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION WITHIN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT OF A WEEKLY TAPE RECORDING OR LOCAL NEWS AND INFORMATION TO BE DISTRIBUTED FREE OF CHARGE.
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Leys Avenue
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2AW
- Phone:
- 01223357642
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window