THE SUN BABIES' NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to organisations benefiting children in Hoxton and it's neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
Governance
- 18 November 1974: Standard registration
- SUN BABIES NURSERY TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas John Ebbutt | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Samantha Audrey Lloyd | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Rob Chapmn | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE ANDREWS | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.51k | £172.53k | £162.92k | £161.98k | £166.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.74k | £75.34k | £62.09k | £69.66k | £209.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 April 2024 | 432 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
07 April 2024 | 432 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 3RD JUNE 1941
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF NURSERY OR CRECHE OR FOR OTHER CHILD WELFARE PURPOSES FOR BENEFIT OF INFANTS AND CHILDREN RESIDING IN HOXTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
HOXTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 02089305921
- Email:
- sunbabiestrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window