VIVDALE LIMITED

Charity Number: 268505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Enhancing and sustaining orthodox religious Judaism by making donations to orthodox religious Jewis institutions and charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £242,643
Total expenditure: £240,375

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 1974: Standard registration
  • 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1121830 GILOH LIMITED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norman Blum Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Gary Sinclair Trustee 19 July 1961
None on record
LORETTA MARKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £178.44k £236.61k £182.14k £635.47k £242.64k
Total expenditure £158.10k £113.05k £152.30k £197.84k £240.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £54.61k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £223.22k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £357.64k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £197.84k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £6.08k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £96.42k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
133 Leeside Crescent
Golders Green
LONDON
NW11 0JN
Phone:
020 8458 0900
Website:

No information available