MILTON KEYNES CHORALE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEMBERS REHEARSE AND PERFORM CHORAL MUSIC FOR PEOPLE IN THE IN THE MILTON KEYNES AREA, DIRECTED BY A PROFESSIONAL CONDUCTOR AND ENGAGING PROFESSSIONAL ORCHESTRAS AND SOLOISTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 19 November 1974: Standard registration
- 06 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1178002 MILTON KEYNES CHORALE
- MK CHORALE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/08/2013 | 15/08/2014 | 15/08/2015 | 15/08/2016 | 15/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.45k | £41.42k | £46.63k | £28.40k | £33.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.47k | £39.24k | £53.08k | £26.95k | £31.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 August 2017 | 04 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2017 | 04 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 15 August 2016 | 08 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2016 | 15 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OCTOBER 1974
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window