SOUTH ZEAL RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a playing field and recreation ground for the benefit of the inhabiants of the parish of South Tawton in such a manner as the committee of mangement from time to time shall think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 30 December 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Spener Stallion | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mark Guscott | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|||||
WENDY JEAN REDSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.14k | £14.41k | £9.83k | £25.29k | £20.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.96k | £27.82k | £17.85k | £10.97k | £23.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 September 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 01 September 2021 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SOUTH TAWTON IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH ZEAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tythe Barn
South Tawton
OKEHAMPTON
Devon
EX20 2LP
- Phone:
- 01837840188
- Email:
- ajdunn1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window