Financial history HORSMONDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 268520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.62k £14.86k £24.03k £9.29k £9.42k
Total expenditure £8.46k £8.54k £9.40k £12.63k £14.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £18.29k N/A N/A